judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT W. SMITH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1066
Short Caption:ROBERT W. SMITH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1594-78Filed Date:08/04/1989

Opening Event Date:08/04/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/04/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/21/1990
Argued/Submitted:06/21/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/19/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert W. Smith N
J. Patrick Anthony YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Margaret A. Flaherty YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SMITH, ROBERT W. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/06/21 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - ANTHONYJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - FLAHERTYM FOR - APPELLEE
08/04/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) J. PATRICK ANTHONY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 091889 SCHPRD DSA
12/04/1989FiledRecord Completed
12/04/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD R
01/16/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 011590 SCHPRD BA
02/20/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 21, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 021690 SCHPRD BE
02/22/1990APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION AJ PANEL SCDATE 030290 SCHPRD OPA
03/15/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/21/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 031290 SCHPRD V
03/21/1990FiledBriefing Completed
03/21/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 032190 SCHPRD BE
04/09/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/18/1990NOTICE FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE: APLT'S UNAUTHORIZED LEAVE FROM ST. ELIZABETH'S HOSPITAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1990MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTED NOTICE OF 6/18 TO DIVISION. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO SHOW CAUSE WHY APPEAL SHOULDN'T BE DIS- MISSED, APLT FUGITIVE. MEH PANELFESCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/21/1990ARGUED PANELFESCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/27/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELFESWGA SCDATE 062190 SCHPRD RDEC
06/27/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/19/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD