judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THADDEUS FOSTER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1115
Short Caption:THADDEUS FOSTER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7602-89Filed Date:09/20/1989

Opening Event Date:09/20/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/10/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantThaddeus Foster N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FOSTER, THADDEUS UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 110389 JMT: APLT'S MO FOR SUM- NOTE - 01 MARY REVERSAL DENIED; FO APLE NOTE - 02 MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE NOTE - 02 GRANTED; FO & A ORDERS ON NOTE - 03 APPEAL IN 89-850 & 89-1115 ARE NOTE - 03 AFFIRMED.
09/20/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/02/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE (APPELLEE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/06/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APLE MO FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1989AFFIRMED SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. MEH PANELFEBEST SCDATE 102789 SCHPRD VS
11/01/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
11/10/1992MANDATE ISSUED