Case Information: 46749 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: MOYA OLSEN LEAR TRUST | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - PR0200065 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Hardesty | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/20/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/08/2006 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from John Lear--check no. 2698. | ||
02/08/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 06-02833 | |
02/08/2006 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Hardesty. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
02/16/2006 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. Transcript requested: 08/12/05. Court Reporter: Kate Murray. | 06-03485 | |
03/13/2006 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 8/12/05. Court Reporter: Kate Murray. | 06-05397 | |
03/20/2006 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 06-05853 | |
09/06/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. PR01-00065: 120 days. | 06-18349 | |
10/19/2006 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter dated October 13, 2006 w/attached documents and courtesy copy of letter dated October 13, 2006 addressed to James Murphy, Trustee. | 06-21597 | |
12/21/2006 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 5. | 06-26226 | |
12/21/2006 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/29/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Motion to Consider Documents and Directing a Response. On October 19, 2006, appellant filed a motion asking this court to consider documents that he attached thereto. To the extent that the documents attached to appellant's motion are part of the record on appeal, they will be considered with the context of our review. Any of those documents that are not in the record will not be reviewed. Respondent shall have 40 days from the date of this order to file and serve a response, explaining why the district court's decision should not be reversed. | 06-26636 | |
07/18/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Respondent's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Respond to Appellant's Appeal Statement. | 07-15707 | |
07/31/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for Extension of Time to File Reply. Response due: 30 days. | 07-16754 | |
08/29/2007 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 07-19113 | |
08/29/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Volumes 1 and 2. | 07-19114 | |
08/29/2007 | Case Status Update | Resubmitted for Decision. | ||
10/05/2007 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter from Appellant John Lear requesting permission to file a reply to Respondent's Answering Breif to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 07-22003 | |
10/16/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. to file Reply. Lear shall have 30 days to file his reply. | 07-22823 | |
11/20/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Answering Brief to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 07-25293 | |
11/20/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Response. Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Answering Brief to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 07-25293 | |
11/20/2007 | Case Status Update | Resubmitted for Decision. | ||
12/10/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. | 07-26659 | |
01/04/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-00055 | |
01/04/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/09/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 7, 2008. | 08-00055 |