judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RUDD, JOSEPH FORSYTHE, IVORNE

Case Information: 86-CV-0457
Short Caption:RUDD, JOSEPH FORSYTHE, IVORNEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA16200-82Filed Date:01/14/1986

Opening Event Date:01/14/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/29/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/03/1986
Argued/Submitted:05/22/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Gloria M. Sodaro NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Howard B. Teller YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Dudley R. Williams YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RUDD, JOSEPH FORSYTHE, IVORNE ET AL
01/14/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/29/1986FiledRecord Completed
12/03/1986FiledBriefing Completed
05/22/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/19/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition