Case Information: 46771 | |||
Short Caption: | SALDANA-VERDIN (MARTIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41501 , 44212 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030472 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/03/2006 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/15/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/15/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 06-03318 | |
02/28/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. | 06-04541 | |
04/14/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on February 8, 2006. | 06-07897 | |
05/03/2006 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 06-09284 | |
05/03/2006 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/23/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Supplemental record (transcript of the distrct court hearing held on January 26, 2006) due: 30 days. | 06-13074 | |
07/07/2006 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: January 26, 2006. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. | 06-14073 | |
09/20/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP07M-MG/WM/MD | 06-19349 | |
10/17/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-20892 | |
10/17/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/24/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 19, 2006. | 06-20892 |