Case Information: 46770 | |||
Short Caption: | FARMER-KIEFE (DANIEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C212146 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/15/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/15/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 06-03315 | |
03/10/2006 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 11/14/05 and 1/18/06. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Book and Sharon Howard. Filed in district court on: March 6, 2006. | 06-05233 | |
03/15/2006 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: January 18, 2006. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. | 06-05604 | |
03/30/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 06-06721 | |
03/31/2006 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: November 14, 2005. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. | 06-06853 | |
04/10/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Motion Granted in Part. Fast track statement and appendix due: 20 days. | 06-07561 | |
04/14/2006 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 06-07883 | |
04/14/2006 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 06-07884 | |
05/02/2006 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 06-09217 | |
06/29/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP | 06-13482 | |
07/25/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-14453 | |
07/25/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/31/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 27, 2006. | 06-14453 |