judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CURTIS, MARY ROSE CUFF, JUNE NORTON

Case Information: 86-CV-0515
Short Caption:CURTIS, MARY ROSE CUFF, JUNE NORTONClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA3889-80Filed Date:03/20/1986

Opening Event Date:03/20/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/01/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/22/1986
Argued/Submitted:02/02/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Thomas A. Gentile YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Glenn H. Carlson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CURTIS, MARY ROSE CUFF, JUNE NORTON ET AL
03/20/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/01/1986FiledRecord Completed
09/22/1986FiledBriefing Completed
02/02/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/14/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition