Case Information: 46751 | |||
Short Caption: | HINTON VS. ROAD & HIGHWAY BUILDERS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0105203 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/14/2006 / Yott, Laurie | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/08/2006 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from The Law Office of Richard C. Blower--check no. 6935. | ||
02/08/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 06-02835 | |
02/15/2006 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Laurie A. Yott. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/24/2006 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 06-04155 | |
04/27/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 06-08891 | |
06/27/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. | 06-13249 | |
07/25/2006 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Dismissal. | 06-15467 | |
08/09/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK | 06-16538 | |
08/09/2006 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |