judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BLACKTREE FARM INC. NATIONAL PERMANENT FEDERAL

Case Information: 86-CV-0459
Short Caption:BLACKTREE FARM INC. NATIONAL PERMANENT FEDERALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Torts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA2589-83Filed Date:03/13/1986

Opening Event Date:03/13/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/23/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/11/1987
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
John H. Spaulding YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Maurice J. Montaldi YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
George Leroy MoranYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BLACKTREE FARM INC. NATIONAL PERMANENT FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOC.,ET.AL.
01/01/1906 MORANG FOR: A.J. ALBANESE
03/13/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/23/1986FiledRecord Completed
06/11/1987FiledBriefing Completed
01/19/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition