judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID MERCEL DANIELS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1009
Short Caption:DAVID MERCEL DANIELS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2878-88Filed Date:08/05/1988

Opening Event Date:08/05/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/08/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/02/1989
Argued/Submitted:03/14/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/06/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid Mercel Daniels N
Paul J. RileyYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
William E. Lawler YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DANIELS, DAVID MERCEL UNITED STATES
08/05/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/25/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PAUL J. RILEY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD DSA
11/08/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RT(44 PGS /RONAN) AD PANEL SCDATE 100488 SCHPRD R
12/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (130 PGS RT - TOOBY) GT PANEL SCDATE 113088 SCHPRD RT
06/08/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/08/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(32 PGS/GRAYBILL) AD PANEL SCDATE 013089 SCHPRD RT
07/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 071889 SCHPRD BA
07/21/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO WITHDRAW PREVIOUS MOTION & FOR EXT. OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/29/89 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-2-89 AD NO OPPO PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1989ORDER GRANT MOTIONS OF APLT TO FL BRF; APLE BRF DUE 11/2/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 081089 SCHPRD U
11/02/1989FiledBriefing Completed
11/02/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 110289 SCHPRD BE
03/14/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/14/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELFEBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1990SUBMITTED PANELFEBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/06/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD