judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM E. GRAY, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1008
Short Caption:WILLIAM E. GRAY, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11268-87Filed Date:08/11/1988

Opening Event Date:08/11/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/13/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/20/1989
Argued/Submitted:01/03/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/05/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam E. Gray, Jr.N
Robert L. Chaves YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Erik P. Christian YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GRAY JR, WILLIAM E. UNITED STATES
08/11/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/17/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/25/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT L. CHAVES, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 100988 SCHPRD R
12/13/1988FiledRecord Completed
12/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(35 PGS/CALHOUN) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (200 PGS RT - CALHOUN) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/03/1989ORDER BA SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORDER. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 031689 SCHPRD BA
04/20/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 19TH (NO OPA) JB PANEL SCDATE 041989 SCHPRD BE
04/26/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/19/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 050189 SCHPRD CHECK
05/19/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 1, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 051989 SCHPRD BE
06/01/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-6-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/06/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1989FiledBriefing Completed
06/20/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE & BRF OF APLE IS FL; SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 061389 SCHPRD OPA
01/03/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/03/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGSCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGSCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/05/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD