judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JEFFREY B. MATHIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1061
Short Caption:JEFFREY B. MATHIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8489-87Filed Date:08/15/1988

Opening Event Date:08/15/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/15/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/09/1990
Argued/Submitted:01/16/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/21/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJeffrey B. Mathis N
Samuel Ed Wilhite YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Nancy J. Woodward YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MATHIS, JEFFREY B. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ANTHONY THOMAS NOTE - 01
08/15/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/29/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ED WILHITE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1988ORDER DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 090888 SCHPRD DSA
10/17/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD DSA
11/23/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (381 PGS. -- TANNER; & 16 PGS. PAVLISH) RJG PANEL SCDATE 101488 SCHPRD R
01/30/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(94 PGS/HART) AD PANEL SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD RT
03/15/1989FiledRecord Completed
03/15/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (296 PGS/GRAYBILL) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/05/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-9-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 051590 SCHPRD BA
05/22/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 06-09-90. NFX GR PANELDDW SCDATE 051690 SCHPRD Q
06/11/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/11/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 9, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD BE
07/18/1990ORDER GRNT APLE MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 08-09-90. NFX GR PANELFF SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD GR
08/09/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/09/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 080990 SCHPRD BE
01/16/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/16/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGSTMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGSTMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/21/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD