Case Information: 46788 | |||
Short Caption: | NAVAS (JULIO) VS. STATE C/W 46786 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 46786 *, 46788 | Related Case(s): | 42159 , 43208 , 46426 , 46967 , 47331 , 47762 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030647 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/16/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/16/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 06-03456 | |
03/28/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED." fn4[We have received all proper person documents, and conclude that no relief is warranted.] NNP06-MD/NB/RP. Nos. 46786/46788. | 06-06457 | |
04/04/2006 | Post-Judgment Petition | Received Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Notice of Petition for Rehearing En Banc. Nos. 46786/46788. (06-07052) | ||
04/18/2006 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP06-MD/NB/RP. Nos. 46786/46788. | 06-08114 | |
05/16/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-08270 | |
05/16/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/05/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 17, 2006. | 06-08270 | |
06/08/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Relief. The request to consolidate and for the recusal of Chief Justice Rose submitted on April 12, 2006, is hereby denied. Nos. 47049/ 46786/ 46788/ 46425/ 46426/ 42158/ 42159/ 46966/ 46967. | 06-12026 |