judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LOMEL A. ALLEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1010
Short Caption:LOMEL A. ALLEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead: 86-CF-1566 Consolidated: 86-CF-1567 , 87-CF-0371 , 88-CF-1010, 88-CF-1578 , 89-CF-0711
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4431-86Filed Date:08/12/1988

Opening Event Date:08/12/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/04/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/25/1989
Argued/Submitted:02/21/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLomel A. Allen N
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Henry S. Hoberman YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ALLEN, LOMEL A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 SEE 86-1567, 86-1566 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 8/25/88 ORD: SS, CONS CASE NOTE - 02 W/86-1566,-1567, & 87-371; NOTE - 03 PETER H. MEYERS APPTD FOR APLT NOTE - 03 APLT TO FL DSA IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 04 CON 86-1566, 86-1567, 87-371 NOTE - 04 CON 88-1578. & 89-711 NOTE - 05 1/5/89 ORD: SS, CONS 88-1578 NOTE - 05 W/86-1566, 87-371 & 88-1010; NOTE - 06 PETER H. MEYERS APPTD FOR APLT NOTE - 06 IN 88-1578; APLT TO FL DSA IN NOTE - 07 88-1578 IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 7/7/89 ORD: CLK TO FL BRF OF NOTE - 08 APLT IN 86-1566,-1567, 87-371, NOTE - 09 88-1010, & -1578; SS, CONS NOTE - 09 89-711 W/86-1566, -1567, 87- NOTE - 10 371, 88-1010, & -1578; PETER NOTE - 10 MEYERS APPTD FOR APLT IN 89- NOTE - 11 711; APLT TO FL DSA IN 89-711 NOTE - 11 IN 10 DAYS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/02/21 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MEYERSP FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - HOBERMANH FOR - APPELLEE
08/12/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/25/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PETER H. MEYERS, ESQ. (SEE 87-371 FOR VOUCHER) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/25/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 & 03. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (13 PGS - OLIVER) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/02/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 090588 SCHPRD DSA
10/04/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR BAIL/BOND PENDING APPEAL APPELLANT'S AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR BOND PENDING APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 112988 SCHPRD OPE
12/12/1988ORDER DENYING MO FOR BOND PENDING APPEAL. ACG PANELNWTE SCDATE 112988 SCHPRD VS
01/04/1989FiledRecord Completed
01/04/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 101188 SCHPRD R
01/05/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05-07. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN 88-1578 JB PANEL SCDATE 011689 SCHPRD DSA
02/13/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/15/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD BA
03/14/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-14-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 15, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/15/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD OPE
05/15/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 15, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD BA
06/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/15/89; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 052989 SCHPRD OPE
06/12/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 08-11. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 061589 SCHPRD BA
07/13/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT IN 89-711 RJG PANEL SCDATE 071789 SCHPRD DSA
08/01/1989MEMORANDUM OF APPELLANT CLARIFYING STATUS OF CONSOLIDATED CASES RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1989RECEIVED APLE MO TO STAY BRIEFING SCHD (NO BE SET YET) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1989RECORD ON APPEAL IN 89-711 RJG PANEL SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD R
08/23/1989ORDER BA IN 86-1566,-1567, 87-371, 88-1010, & -1578 DEEMED BRF IN 89-711; BE DUE IN 30. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 092589 SCHPRD BA
09/25/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-23-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 092289 SCHPRD BE
10/23/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/25/1989FiledBriefing Completed
10/25/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD OPA
12/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(JUDGE WINFIELD) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/21/1990ARGUED PANELRGTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1990DISMISSED JUDGMENT DISMISSING APPEAL PANELRGTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE
09/21/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 2796
10/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD