judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TONY M. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1014
Short Caption:TONY M. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2636-83Filed Date:08/10/1988

Opening Event Date:08/10/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/01/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/25/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/14/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTony M. Johnson N
John C. Krollman YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Steven N. Gersten YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, TONY M. UNITED STATES
08/10/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/25/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN C. KROLLMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/02/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD DSA
11/10/1988RECEIVED MOTION OF APPELLANT (PRO SE) FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1988ORDER CRT APPTD COUNSEL, DENY PRO SE REQ OF APLT TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 101188 SCHPRD R
03/10/1989RECEIVED MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDG- MENT, APPELLANT PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/01/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(18 PGS/DAVIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
07/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-25-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 071189 SCHPRD BA
08/02/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO FILE BRF ON OR BEF 8/25/89 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 071189 SCHPRD N
08/30/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 60 DAYS TO OCTOBER 24TH JB PANEL SCDATE 082589 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF DUE BY 10/2/89; NFX. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD OPE
10/02/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL SIXTY(60)DAYS GT PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD BA
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO EXTENT BRF DUE BY 11/2/89; NFX DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 100689 SCHPRD Q
03/12/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 10 DAYS OR APPOINTMENT WILL BE VACATED JB PANELRO SCDATE 110289 SCHPRD BA
03/22/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 032290 SCHPRD BA
04/25/1990FiledBriefing Completed
04/25/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 042690 SCHPRD BE
09/14/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/14/1990SUBMITTED PANELFEBEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEBEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD