Case Information: 46795 | |||
Short Caption: | STEVENSON (RONALD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 43706 , 61872 , 63028 , 76747 , 76747-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - CR29440 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/16/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/16/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 06-03570 | |
04/17/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Fast Track. Appellant's counsel Martin G. Crowley shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. | 06-07973 | |
04/25/2006 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order of April 17, 2006. | 06-08651 | |
05/04/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. to withdraw as counsel for appellant. Crowley may not withdraw until he has fulfilled the obligations placed on trial counsel by NRAP 3C(b). Fast track statement and appendix due: 40 days. | 06-09321 | |
06/13/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 06-12392 | |
06/20/2006 | Fast Track Brief | Received Fast Track Statement. | 06-12890 | |
06/20/2006 | Appendix | Received Appendix. Appellant's Fast Track Appendix. | 06-12891 | |
07/11/2006 | Fast Track Brief | Received Fast Track Response. | 06-14278 | |
07/14/2006 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata. | 06-14685 | |
07/14/2006 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. Martin Crowley. | 06-14688 | |
07/18/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion. Request to File Appendix Under Seal or for Court to Unseal Lower Court Decision. | 06-14908 | |
07/27/2006 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Consolidation of Pleadings and Motion to Strike. | 06-15623 | |
07/28/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. the clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on June 20, 2006, and the fast track response received on July 11, 2006. On July 18, 2006, counsel for appellant filed a motion to file the appendix under seal. The clerk of this court shall remove page 120 from the appendix and seal it. This court has reviewed all documents that Stevenson has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and this court concludes that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted. Any further proper person documents submitted by Stevenson shall be returned to Stevenson, unfiled. | 06-15678 | |
07/28/2006 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 06-12890 | |
07/28/2006 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Per 07/28/06 order, removed page 120 and sealed it. | 06-12891 | |
07/28/2006 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 06-14278 | |
09/12/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP07M-MG/WM/MD | 06-18822 | |
10/10/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-20631 | |
10/10/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/13/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 11, 2006. | 06-20631 |