judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN D. IRBY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1055
Short Caption:JOHN D. IRBY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead: 84-CF-0306 Consolidated: 86-CF-0738 , 88-CF-1055
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6850-82Filed Date:08/15/1988

Opening Event Date:08/15/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/31/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/14/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/13/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/06/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn D. Irby NPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901IRBY, JOHN D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 10/12/88 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 01 FOR APPMT OF COUNSEL; GRANT MO NOTE - 02 OF APLT TO PROCEED IN F/P & NOTE - 02 CLK OF SUPER CRT TO TRANSMIT NOTE - 03 REC W/OUT FEE; APLT TO FL DSA NOTE - 03 IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 04 6/30/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLE NOTE - 04 TO CONS THIS CASE W/84-306 & NOTE - 05 86-738; GRANT MO OF APLE FOR NOTE - 05 LV TO FL MO FOR SUMM AFFIRM & NOTE - 06 CLK TO FL MO; DENY MO'S OF NOTE - 06 APLT FOR SUMM REV & TO TREAT NOTE - 07 CASE AS CONCEDED & APLE'S MO NOTE - 07 FOR SUMM AFFIRM; W. GARY NOTE - 08 KOHLMAN APPTD FOR APLT IN THIS NOTE - 08 CASE; BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 NOTE - 09 DAYS. NOTE - 09 NOTE - 10 CON 84-306 & 86-738 NOTE - 10 NOTE - 11 06/14/90 ORD: GRANT APLE'S MO NOTE - 11 FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE & MO OF NOTE - 12 APLE FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE NOTE - 12 FL ON 1/13/90, IN NO. 88-1055 NOTE - 13 SHALL BE DEEMED ITS BRF IN NOTE - 13 APPEAL NO. 88-1055; F/O CLK TO NOTE - 14 SCHEDULE THESE APPEALS FOR NOTE - 14 CONSID BEFORE A MERITS DIV OF NOTE - 15 THIS CRT ASAP. NOTE - 15
08/15/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/26/1988LETTER REQUESTING APLT TO FILE FORM 5 AFFIDAVIT & REQUEST FOR APPT. OF COUNSEL GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS OF APPELLANT'S (WITH ATTACH- MENTS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD ANSA
10/12/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 091488 SCHPRD Q
10/28/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLR PANEL SCDATE 102488 SCHPRD DSA
10/28/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD R
10/31/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/22/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PRO SE MLR PANEL SCDATE 010389 SCHPRD BA
01/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH 84-306 & 86-738 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEE FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE MLR PANEL SCDATE 010489 SCHPRD BE
01/13/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/27/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APLE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RJG PANEL SCDATE 012589 SCHPRD OPA
02/03/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL APPELLANT (PRO SE) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/30/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-09. DAS PANELSTSC SCDATE 032489 SCHPRD TMC
06/30/1989APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM OF APPELLEE. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/09/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-8-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 080989 SCHPRD BA
08/17/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/8/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 082189 SCHPRD CHECK
04/05/1990STATEMENT OF APPELLANT, THROUGH COUNSEL, RE: APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 090889 SCHPRD BA
04/27/1990ORDER BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 041090 SCHPRD K
05/09/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION APLE'S MO TO CONSIDER MO FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IN CASE 88-1055 AS ITS BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1990FiledBriefing Completed
06/14/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF **FOR ADS PURPOSE ONLY** 1/14/89 MO FOR SUMM AFFIRM DEEMED AS BE IN THIS CASE.GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11 THUR 15 GW PANELRO SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD V
10/11/1990RECEIVED LETTER RE: ORAL ARGUMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/23/1990ORDER DENY APLT'S COUNSEL'S MOTION TO ADVANCE ARGUMENT TO 8:30 AM TO BE ARGUED AT 9:30 AM. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1990MOTION TO SUBMIT WITHOUT ARGUMENT APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO SUBMIT W/0 ORAL ARGUMENT. PANELRONWFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/13/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGNWFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (31 PGS - SIMMS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1991AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART JUDGMENT AF IN PART JDGMT ON APP/CAUSE RM FOR FRTHR PRCDGS re 5th AMENDMENT PRIVILEGE PANELRGNWFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRM METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE
01/17/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 0162
02/06/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD