Case Information: 46796 | |||
Short Caption: | LISONI VS. LAWSUIT FINANCING | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 47770 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A498224 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/22/2006 / Saint-Aubin, Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/17/2006 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Barry Levinson--check no. 1119. | ||
02/17/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 06-03592 | |
02/17/2006 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
02/21/2006 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. 11/8/05 Judgment; 11/8/05 Order; 11/9/05 Notice of Entry of Order; 1/23/06 Judgment. Due Date: 10 days | ||
02/22/2006 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
02/27/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. 11/8/05 Order; 11/9/05 Notice of Entry of Order; and 1/23/06 Voluntary Dismissal. | 06-04367 | |
03/01/2006 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Robert F. Saint-Aubin (Documents filed on November 8, 2005 and January 23, 2006 in District Court). | ||
03/03/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 06-04799 | |
03/07/2006 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Robert F. Saint-Aubin (Case Appeal Statement). | ||
03/15/2006 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | ||
04/05/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 06-07246 | |
04/17/2006 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. | 06-08011 | |
05/08/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 06-09646 | |
05/08/2006 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 06-09647 | |
05/24/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). fn1[Respondent's April 17, 2006, motion to dismiss is denied as moot.] SNP/CLK | 06-10891 | |
05/24/2006 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |