judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN W. FRANKLIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1057
Short Caption:JOHN W. FRANKLIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7405-86Filed Date:08/12/1988

Opening Event Date:08/12/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/20/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/15/1989
Argued/Submitted:01/22/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn W. Franklin N
Irwin A. Goldberg YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FRANKLIN, JOHN W. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: PERNELL BELL & TYRONE NOTE - 01 LOWRY
08/12/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/29/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) IRWIN A. GOLDBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/21/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 090888 SCHPRD DSA
11/16/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 101188 SCHPRD R
04/20/1989FiledRecord Completed
04/20/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/20/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(221 PGS/SCHOCH) AD PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
05/31/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR AN ADDITIONAL 40 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 053089 SCHPRD BA
06/27/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/10/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 060789 SCHPRD OPE
07/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF LATE GT PANEL SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD BA
07/12/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV & BRF OF APLT IS FL; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 072689 SCHPRD X
08/15/1989FiledBriefing Completed
08/15/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 082889 SCHPRD BE
01/22/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/22/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWFEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWFEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD