judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL A. ROSS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0934
Short Caption:MICHAEL A. ROSS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F13839-87Filed Date:07/20/1988

Opening Event Date:07/20/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/22/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/27/1991
Argued/Submitted:11/01/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/10/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael A. Ross N
Marlon S. Charles YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Demaurice F. Smith YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ROSS, MICHAEL A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: VINCENT CALHOUN NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 5/2/91 ORD. BA DUE 7/17, BE NOTE - 02 DUE 8/21, RBA DUE 9/9, NFX; NOTE - 03 TO BE SCHD ON NOVEMBER CAL. NOTE - 03
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/11/01 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - CHARLESM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SMITHDE FOR - APPELLEE
07/20/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/15/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MARLON S. CHARLES, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/23/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 082588 SCHPRD DSA
10/20/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD R
04/14/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (20 PAGES TRANSCRIPT - MITCHELL) MLR PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
04/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER ADDITIONAL TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 052489 SCHPRD BA
05/17/1989ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING APLT BR UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSC DOCKETED. FVH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/30/1990ORDER APPELLANT'S BRIEF DUE W/IN 40 DAYS FROM DATE OF ORDER (RECORD COMPLETE) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 111189 SCHPRD RT
06/28/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO (?) AD PANEL SCDATE 070990 SCHPRD BA
10/25/1990ORDER APLT IS DIRECTED TO FILE STATE W/IN 10 DYS WHETHER RT WILL BE ORDERED & COMPLETION DATE JB PANELRBH SCDATE 071290 SCHPRD U
11/06/1990STATEMENT OF STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 110590 SCHPRD STATE
03/22/1991FiledRecord Completed
03/22/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (31 PGS. -- MITCHELL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 020791 SCHPRD SR
05/02/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2-3. AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/17/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 071791 SCHPRD BA
08/22/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1 DAY PMB PANEL SCDATE 082191 SCHPRD BE
08/22/1991RECEIVED BRIEF OF APLE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/27/1991FiledBriefing Completed
08/27/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/27/1991ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE FOR LV TO FL ITS BRF & APLE'S BRF IS FL. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 090391 SCHPRD OPA
10/08/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/01/1991ARGUED PANELTESTNW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELTESTNW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/10/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD