judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT L. LENEAR, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0956
Short Caption:ROBERT L. LENEAR, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F764-88Filed Date:08/02/1988

Opening Event Date:08/02/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/01/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/09/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/20/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/22/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert L. Lenear, Jr.N
John Edward Williams YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Oscar S. Mayers YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LENEAR JR., ROBERT L. UNITED STATES
08/02/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/08/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN EDWARD WILLIAMS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 101188 SCHPRD DSA
11/01/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/01/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (226 PGS RT - RUST) GT PANEL SCDATE 093088 SCHPRD R
01/13/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE BR OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APNT SHLD NOT BE VACATED. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD BA
01/25/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S RESPONSE TO OTSC DATED 1/13/89 PANEL SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD BA
01/27/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE TO JANUARY 13TH ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 020689 SCHPRD CHECK
02/14/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO LV TO FL RESPONSE & BRF OF APLT BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD N
03/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-3-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD BE
04/24/1989ORDER GRT APLE MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FILE BRF TO 5/3/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD V
05/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-3-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 050389 SCHPRD BE
06/02/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1989FiledBriefing Completed
06/09/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/09/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM & BRF OF APLE IS FL; SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD OPA
11/20/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/20/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN EDWARD WILLIAMS, ESQ. (TO FILE PETITION FOR CERT.) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/22/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1990NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIDATED FEBRUARY 28, 1990 IN SUPREME COURT #89-7197 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/30/1990NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN SUPREME COURT GG DENIED 5/14/90 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD