judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES V. ROBINSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1015
Short Caption:JAMES V. ROBINSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead: 85-CF-1073 Consolidated:88-CF-1015
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5082-84Filed Date:

Opening Event Date:Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:06/29/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/29/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames V. Robinson N
Daniel M. Schember YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Patricia A. Riley YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ROBINSON, JAMES V. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 85-1073 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 11/17/89 ORD: THE LAST WORD OF NOTE - 02 THE OPINION, AFFIRMED, SHALL NOTE - 03 BE AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS: NOTE - 03 JUDGMENT IN NO. 85-1073 NOTE - 04 AFFIRMED; APPEAL IN NO. NOTE - 04 88-1015 DISMISSED.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/06/29 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SCHEMBERD FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - FISHERJ FOR - APPELLEE
05/27/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (7 PGS RT - CURLEY) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/25/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DANIEL M. SCHEMBER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD DSA
08/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH #85-1073 AND FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/16/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS AFTER FILING OF APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF (NO OPA) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1988ORDER GRANT MO OT CONS 85-1073 & 88- 1015;BRF OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RECORD IS FILED. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 091588 SCHPRD Q
11/14/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 101188 SCHPRD R
12/22/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLR PANEL SCDATE 122688 SCHPRD BA
01/24/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-26-89 AD PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/26/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 102688 SCHPRD CHECK
02/13/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1989COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT (5 PGS/WILLIAMS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/29/1989ARGUED PANELMKFEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESTMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -FE CITE 565 A.2d 964
10/05/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 2242
10/19/1989APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1989ORDER DENY APLT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING (SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 4) SL PANELFESTMK SCDATE 102589 SCHPRD VS
11/29/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1995RECEIVED - aplt's record in appeal certification