Case Information: 46790 | |||
Short Caption: | CONNOR VS. SAHARA SURGERY CENTER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 43920 , 45087 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A430916 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/21/2006 / Buchanan, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/16/2006 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Beckley Singleton--check no. 213110. | ||
02/16/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 06-03525 | |
02/21/2006 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/06/2006 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 06-04919 | |
04/21/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 4, 2006. | 06-08513 | |
05/08/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 22, 2006. | 06-09628 | |
05/24/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 06-10972 | |
05/24/2006 | Settlement Agreement | Filed Settlement Agreement. | 06-10973 | |
05/24/2006 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 06-10974 | |
05/31/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 06-11382 | |
05/31/2006 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |