Case Information: 46791 | |||
Short Caption: | GREENE VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41222 , 41416 , 42329 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CF9910013 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/01/2006 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/16/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/16/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 06-03528 | |
03/24/2006 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 06-06303 | |
04/27/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due in District Court Case No. CF9910013: 120 days. | 06-08946 | |
08/01/2006 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4. | 06-15975 | |
08/01/2006 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
10/18/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's order." NNP07-NB/JH/RP | 06-21396 | |
11/14/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-22875 | |
11/14/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/28/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 17, 2006. | 06-22875 |