Case Information: 46783 | |||
Short Caption: | GREWAL VS. REGENCY AUTO SPA | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A507659 Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A508205 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/22/2006 / Christensen, Thomas | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/05/2007 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/15/2006 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Berkley, Gordon & Goldstein, LLP--check no. 11946. | ||
02/15/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 06-03389 | |
02/22/2006 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas F. Christensen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/02/2006 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. | 06-04700 | |
03/08/2006 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 06-05105 | |
03/09/2006 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Adams & Rocheleau, LLC--check no. 30186. | ||
03/09/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Nevada First Business Brokers) (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 06-05204 | |
03/10/2006 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. Thomas F. Christensen. (supplemental notice of appeal) | ||
03/16/2006 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/28/05. To Court Reporter: Paula Walsh. | 06-05678 | |
03/20/2006 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (Appellants) | 06-05870 | |
03/27/2006 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 06-06443 | |
05/11/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 06-09975 | |
05/19/2006 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Paula Walsh: 30 days to file transcripts or inform this court that the transcripts were previously filed in the district court. Appellant Grewal: 10 days to file transcript request or no transcript request. Each appellant: 75 days to file their opening briefs. Therafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Fn1[A copy of that transcript request forn is attached to this order.] | 06-10553 | |
05/26/2006 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: November 28, 2005. Court Reporter: Paula Walsh. | 06-11199 | |
06/09/2006 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Appellant Grewal. | ||
06/21/2006 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/28/05. To Court Reporter: Paula Walsh. | 06-12925 | |
06/29/2006 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Court Reporter Walsh regarding transcripts. | 06-13480 | |
08/01/2006 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Appellant Grewal's Opening Brief. | 06-15955 | |
08/01/2006 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 06-15956 | |
08/04/2006 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. (Nevada First Business Brokers, Inc.) | 06-16164 | |
09/05/2006 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. (Respondent/Cross-Respondent Regency Auto Spa's Consolidated Answering Brief). | 06-18236 | |
10/02/2006 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Appellant Grewal. | 06-20126 | |
10/13/2006 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed (Appellant Nevada First Business Brokers). | ||
02/02/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Michael F. Bohn as counsel for respondent/cross-appellant in place of Gregory A. Miles. | 07-02745 | |
02/05/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Submitting Appeal for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. fn1[NRAP 34(f).] | 07-02826 | |
02/05/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/15/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. fn1[We have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal.] "We affirm the district court's summary judgment." SNP07-MG/MD/MC | 07-06032 | |
04/10/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-07998 | |
04/10/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/18/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 13, 2007. | 07-07998 |