judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PAUL R. TIBBS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0993
Short Caption:PAUL R. TIBBS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead:88-CF-0993Consolidated: 92-CO-1238
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1389-87Filed Date:07/26/1988

Opening Event Date:07/26/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/16/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/11/1993
Argued/Submitted:06/03/1993
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/10/1993

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPaul R. Tibbs N
Andrew J. DelehantyYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Anthony Asuncion YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TIBBS, PAUL R. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902(23-110 STATUS)
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 101188 ORDER: DENY MO FOR RT NOTE - 01 W/OUT PREJUDICE TO ITS RENEWAL NOTE - 02 BEFORE THE TRIAL COURT FOR CON NOTE - 02 IN THE 1ST INSTANCE; FO: COUNS NOTE - 03 W/IN 10 DAYS TO ORDER RT & NOTE - 03 FILE STATE W/THIS CT W/IN THAT NOTE - 04 SAME TIME INDICATING RT HAS NOTE - 04 BEEN ORDERED. NOTE - 05 10/18/91 ORD: APLT MO X TM FL NOTE - 05 BRF GRNTD. CNSL TO ADVISE CRT NOTE - 06 W/30 DYS FRM DT OF ORDER AS TO NOTE - 06 STATUS OF PENDG MO FLD IN TRL NOTE - 07 CRT PURSUANT TO DC CODE NOTE - 07 23-110.
07/26/1988NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/25/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ANDREW J.J. DELEHANTY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD DSA
09/06/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR PRODUCTION OF TRANSCRIPTS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD M
10/21/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD R
11/10/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO COMPLY W/THIS CT'S 10/10 ORD OR VACATE & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 102088 SCHPRD STATE
11/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER PRODUCTION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER DATED 11/10/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE OUT OF TIME GT PANEL SCDATE 112188 SCHPRD STATE
01/30/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO FILE STATE; & GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 40 DAYS AFT RT. PANELRBH SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD OPE
01/30/1989STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO 10/10/88 ORDER. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (316 PGS. -- SHELTON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
07/14/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAYS TO AUGUST 23TH (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 071789 SCHPRD BA
07/25/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/23/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 071889 SCHPRD M
08/23/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/2/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 082389 SCHPRD BA
08/25/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/24/89; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 082489 SCHPRD M
09/19/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ORDER 9-13-89 JUDGE KESSLER AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL REQUESTED TRANSCRIPT IS PREPARED JB PANEL SCDATE 092489 SCHPRD BA
10/02/1989RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM RAMOS - 10/22/89 - 10/29/89 PROC. (DUP REQUEST) JB PANEL SCDATE 021690 SCHPRD RT
11/16/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD U
01/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (134 PGS. -- MORRIS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 031790 SCHPRD RT
02/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (10 PGS. -- SHELTON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 051190 SCHPRD RT
02/16/1990RECORD COMPLETED
07/19/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE BY 9/11/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY 10/11/91. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 062891 SCHPRD U
09/11/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL SUPERIOR COURT HAS ACTED ON THE MOTION TO VACATE & SET ASIDE JUDGEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 091191 SCHPRD BA
10/18/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05 - 07 GR PANELJAC SCDATE 100791 SCHPRD GR
11/27/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO FILE LATE & REPORT TO COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 111891 SCHPRD CHECK
12/13/1991ORDER GR MO OF APLT LV TO FL REPORT LODGED REPORT FLD. APLT TO FL STATUS IN 30 OF 23-110. AC PANELRBH SCDATE 121191 SCHPRD K
01/14/1992STATEMENT OF APLT RE: 23-110 MOTION 12/13/91 ORDER AJ PANEL SCDATE 011392 SCHPRD STATE
02/25/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (JMT & CONVIC.; GOVT'S OPPO TO DEF'S MO TO VAC. & SET ASIDE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/07/1992The brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. Any requests for an extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only in extraordinary circumstances. (By )
06/16/1992DESIGNATION OF RECORD (additional)
06/16/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
06/16/1992RECEIVED appellant's brief
07/15/1992ORD GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD lodged documents are filed as a supp rec.
07/15/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD
07/15/1992ORDER GRANTING APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEFlodged brief of appellant is filed. Appellee shall file the brief on July 20, 1992.
07/15/1992APPELLANT'S BRIEF
07/15/1992APPELLEE'S BRIEF
07/15/1992BRIEFS COMPLETED
08/03/1992FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
10/09/1992ORDER Sua Sponte, ORDERED that this appeal has been scheduled on the summary calendar on Thursday, November 19, 1992, at 1:30 p.m. (JWR)
10/22/1992APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE this appeal with 92-CO-1238.
11/06/1992VOTE SHEET appellant's motion to consolidate two appeals
11/13/1992ORDER On consideration of appellant's motion to consolidate two appeals, there appearing to be no opposition thereto, and it appearing that appeal No. 88-CF-993 is scheduled on the summary calendar of November 19, 1992, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted. Appellant is directed to file a brief in appeal No. 92-CO-1238 within 30 days from the date of this order. Appellee's brief in No. 92-CO-1238 shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the calendar setting for November 19, 1992, is vacated and the Clerk is directedto reschedule the consolidated appeals as a special sitting on the summary calendar after the brief are filed in No. 92-CO-1238. (Per Curiam)
12/29/1992VOTE SHEET aplt's motion to accept brief and appellant's motion to delay filing the brief
01/13/1993ORDER Grant appellant's motion to accept the brief filed in 88-CF-993 as his brief F/O deny as moot appellant's motion to delay filing its brief in 92-CO-1238. F/O appellee shall file its brief in 30 days from the date of this order.(ROTESU)
01/13/1993CHECK appellee's brief due on 2/15/92
02/11/1993APPELLEE'S BRIEF (in 92 co 1238)
02/11/1993BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/01/1993APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
06/03/1993FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/03/1993SUBMITTED (RO,TE,SU)
07/19/1993AFFIRMED OPINION
08/10/1993MANDATE ISSUED