judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHNSON (JEFFREY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 46794
Short Caption:JOHNSON (JEFFREY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C204749Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/16/2007How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/16/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 06-03569
04/17/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. Appellant's counsel Cristina A. Hinds shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. 06-07972
05/01/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Continue Due Date of Fast Track Statement and Rough Draft Transcripts for Thirty (30) Days Per NRAP 26(b). 06-09133
05/09/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. Fast track statement and appendix due: 15 days. 06-09676
06/01/2006Fast Track BriefReceived Fast Track Statement. 06-11515
06/13/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-12369
06/21/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on June 1, 2006. 06-12903
06/21/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 06-11515
06/21/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 06-11516
06/21/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 06-12524
06/29/2006MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion for Full Briefing and Argument Pursuant to NRAP 27 and NRAP 3C (j)(1). 06-13473
08/15/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Rough draft transcript form due: 10 days. 06-17018
08/18/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. This court has concluded that full briefing of this appeal is warranted, and the motion is therefore granted. fn1[Counsel need not file a new appendix and may utilize the fast track appendix previously filed in this court. If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party must file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. fn2[Should either counsel cite to transcripts not previously prepared, counsel shall file and serve a request of transcripts.] Thereafter, briefing shall proceed as set forth in NRAP 31. 06-17258
08/29/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 12/05/05. Court Reporter: Peggy Isom. Filed in district court on: 08/25/06. 06-17908
09/14/2006TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 12/05/05. Court Reporter: Peggy Isom. 06-19005
09/25/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Appellant's Opening Brief - due 15 days.
10/06/2006MotionFiled Motion. for Grant of Requested Writ or, in the Alternative, for Remand to the District Court for an Evidentiary Hearing in Light of this Court's September 14, 2006 decision in State v. Colosimo, 122 Nev. Adv. Op. 81 (2006). 06-20535
10/16/2006MotionFiled Motion. to Stay or in the Alternative, to Reset Full Briefing Schedule in Light of the Court's Decision in State v. Colosimo, 122 Nev. Adv. Op. (2006). 06-21230
10/18/2006MotionFiled Response to Motion. State's Response to Appellant's Motion for Grant of Requested Writ or, in the Alternative, for Remand to the District Court for an Evidentiary Hearing in Light of the Court's Decision in State v. Colosimo, 122 Nev. Adv. Op. 81 (2006). 06-21441
11/02/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. and Directing the filing of the Opening Brief. This court will not resolve the merits of this appeal until all the issues have been fully briefed. We deny appellant's motion to grant his petition for writ of habeas corpus and deny respondent's request for this court to affirm the district court's decision. Because we deny the relief requested by the parties, we also deny appellant's motion to stay the briefing schedule. Opening brief due: 10 days. Briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31 and our August 18, 2006, order. 06-22363
11/21/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 30 days. 06-23834
11/28/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to file Opening Brief. Opening brief due: December 18, 2006. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 06-24288
01/17/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. to File Opening Brief. To date, appellant has failed to file the opening brief. Due: 10 days. We caution appellant that failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against counsel for appellant. 07-01173
01/31/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 4 days requested 07-02536
02/02/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for Enlargement of Time. Opening brief due: February 5, 2007. Any additional extensions of time to file the opening brief will be granted only on showing of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 07-02788
02/05/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-02844
02/05/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant's Amended Appendix. 07-02845
03/09/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. 07-05637
04/16/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed.
06/14/2007Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Parraguirre, Hardesty and Saitta, JJ. Author: Hardesty, J. We concur: Parraguirre and Saitta, JJ. 123 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 17. NNP07 07-13005
07/05/2007Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 07-14670
08/08/2007Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-17376
09/04/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-18537
09/04/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/11/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 7, 2007. 07-18537