Case: 08-10-00150-CR
08-10-00150-CR
05/19/2010
Indecency with a Child
Ignacio Munoz
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/10/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
03/07/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/17/2012 | Mandate issued | | |||||
10/26/2011 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
09/22/2011 | Submitted | | |||||
06/30/2011 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
06/10/2011 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
06/10/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
05/20/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
05/20/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
04/12/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
04/12/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
03/07/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
01/19/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
01/19/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
12/20/2010 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
12/20/2010 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
12/15/2010 | Hearing record filed | | |||||
12/14/2010 | Hearing record filed | | |||||
11/18/2010 | Order entered | | |||||
11/03/2010 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
10/06/2010 | Order entered | | |||||
10/06/2010 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
10/01/2010 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
09/07/2010 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
09/07/2010 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
07/26/2010 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
07/26/2010 | Extension of time to file clerks record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/26/2010 | Extension of time to file clerks record filed | | |||||
07/07/2010 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
07/07/2010 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
05/27/2010 | Order entered | | |||||
05/26/2010 | Amended notice of appeal filed | | |||||
05/21/2010 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
05/19/2010 | Notice to trial court that certification is missing | | |||||
05/19/2010 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/17/2012 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Jaime E. Esparza Hon. Douglas K. Fletcher |
Munoz, Ignacio | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Justin B. Underwood |
Trial Court Information
409th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Sam Medrano
20090D03488
20 Yrs. IDTDCJ