Case Information: 46775 | |||
Short Caption: | MANGOLD VS. CLARK COUNTY | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 43762 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A449601 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/17/2006 / Buchanan, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/15/2006 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Richard Segerblom Ltd.--check no. 11631. | ||
02/15/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 06-03326 | |
02/17/2006 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/08/2006 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 06-05108 | |
03/30/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 06-06716 | |
04/05/2006 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 06-07168 | |
04/27/2006 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | ||
05/03/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due: 15 days. Briefing schedule and transcripts suspended pending further order of this court. | 06-09254 | |
05/09/2006 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 06-09722 | |
05/19/2006 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellants. | 06-10604 | |
06/01/2006 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. | 06-11508 | |
06/29/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH | 06-13394 | |
07/25/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-14454 | |
07/25/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/31/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 27, 2006. | 06-14454 |