judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT L. SPEARS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0970
Short Caption:ROBERT L. SPEARS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F4105-87Filed Date:07/28/1988

Opening Event Date:07/28/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/20/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/24/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/09/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/22/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert L. Spears N
Boniface K. CobbinaYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sherri L. Schornstein YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SPEARS, ROBERT L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: HELEN WASHINGTON NOTE - 01
07/28/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BONIFACE K. COBBINA, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/09/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS JB PB PANEL SCDATE 082688 SCHPRD DSA
09/09/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1988FiledRecord Completed
10/20/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/20/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 092788 SCHPRD R
11/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 29TH JB PANEL SCDATE 112988 SCHPRD BA
12/08/1988RECEIVED CERTIFICATION OF 11/24/87 RT FROM CT RPTR SWAGERTY. EBP PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1989ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 10 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD OPE
01/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-18-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 011789 SCHPRD BA
01/18/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 30TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT BRF TO BE FL IN 10 DAYS. PB PANELRO SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD Q
02/17/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 021789 SCHPRD BA
03/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(180 PGS/SCHERTZER) AD PANEL SCDATE 070289 SCHPRD RT
03/20/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 24, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 032489 SCHPRD BE
04/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-24-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1989ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING BE TO AND INCLUDING 5/24/89. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/24/1989FiledBriefing Completed
05/24/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 052489 SCHPRD BE
06/01/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(89 PGS/PAVLISH) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (6 PGS. -- GRAYBILL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
07/18/1989ORDER DENY MO FOR EXT OF TM TO FL RT - RT DUE IN 10 DAYS. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD RT
10/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (86 PGS RT - HAWKINS) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/09/1989SUBMITTED PANELFESTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/01/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/22/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD