judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIE K. BEAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1060
Short Caption:WILLIE K. BEAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1381-88Filed Date:08/15/1988

Opening Event Date:08/15/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/18/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/06/1989
Argued/Submitted:03/15/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/19/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWillie K. Bean N
Jane Carol NormanNN
AppellantJohn Doe N
George Anthony Fisher YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Mary B. Murphy YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BEAN, WILLIE K. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 1/10/89 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 02 OF JANE CAROL NORMAN & APPT NOTE - 02 GEORGE ANTHONY FISHER FOR APLT NOTE - 03 BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 03
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/03/15 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - FISHERGE FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - MURPHYMAR FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 NORMANJA VACATED 1/10/89.
08/15/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/29/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JANE CAROL NORMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 090888 SCHPRD DSA
11/18/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/18/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 101488 SCHPRD R
12/19/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 122888 SCHPRD BA
01/10/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GEORGE ANTHONY FISHER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 122988 SCHPRD CHECK
01/31/1989RECEIVED LETTER DATED 1/28/89 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE, RE COURT AP- POINTED COUNSEL MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL FORTY(40)DAYS AFTER THE TRANSCRIPT HAS BEEN FILED GT PANEL SCDATE 022089 SCHPRD BA
02/24/1989LETTER TO APLT IN RESPONSE TO HIS LTR OF 1/28/89 SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 40 DAYS AFTER RT. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 021589 SCHPRD M
03/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(8 PGS/ARTIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/01/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/01/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(134 PGS/GLEASON) AD PANEL SCDATE 072289 SCHPRD RT
06/02/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 7-5-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 061289 SCHPRD BA
06/22/1989ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING BA UNTIL 7-5-89. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 26TH (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 070589 SCHPRD BA
07/06/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/26/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 071089 SCHPRD CHECK
07/26/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/16/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 072689 SCHPRD BA
08/01/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/16/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 080789 SCHPRD OPE
08/16/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-22-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 081689 SCHPRD BA
08/23/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO FL APLT BRF; APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 082589 SCHPRD N
10/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-17-89 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 101889 SCHPRD BE
10/24/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/17/89. GW PANELRO SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD V
11/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 1, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 111789 SCHPRD BE
12/01/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/06/1989FiledBriefing Completed
12/06/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD V
03/15/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/15/1990ARGUED PANELRGNWTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1990APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMO& APPELLANT, JOINTLY, TO APRIL 6, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMO(SECOND REQUEST) TO APRIL 13, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S MEMO ON MERGER OF OFFENSES FOR PURPOSES OF CONVICTION & SENTENCING RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/16/1990APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1990ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL SUPP BRF & CLK TO FL SUPP BRF OF APLE. DAS PANELRONWTE SCDATE 040590 SCHPRD VS
04/24/1990APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1990LETTER FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OF APLT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1990REMANDED ORDER RM CAUSE FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS CONSISTENT w/OP PANELRGNWTE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/31/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -OPN JUDGE -NW CITE 576 A.2d 187
05/31/1990OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - NW PAGE # - 1454
06/13/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL LODGED SMA. MEH PANELRONWTE SCDATE 051190 SCHPRD M
06/13/1990APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1990PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC OF APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD