judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GARNELL A. CAMPBELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1059
Short Caption:GARNELL A. CAMPBELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7212-86Filed Date:08/15/1988

Opening Event Date:08/15/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/18/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/09/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/25/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/18/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGarnell A. Campbell N
Donald R. Lumpkins YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Carolyn K. Kolben YN
John R. Fisher YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CAMPBELL, GARNELL A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: JAMES COLEMAN NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 10/18/89 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 02 FOR STAY W/OUT PREJ TO APLT NOTE - 03 SEEKING SUCH RELIEF IN THE TRL NOTE - 03 CRT IN THE FIRST INSTANCE;BRF NOTE - 04 OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 04
08/15/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/29/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DONALD R. LUMPKINS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/08/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 090888 SCHPRD DSA
12/06/1988RECORD ON APPEAL RT(123 PGS/SWAGERTY)RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 101488 SCHPRD R
01/04/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR PRODUCTION OF TRANSCRIPT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR PRODUCTION OF RT ONLY TO EXTENT THAT RT IS DUE BY 6/30/89. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 110188 SCHPRD RT
08/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (211 PGS - ASHBOCK) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY EXECUTION OF SENTENCE PENDING APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/18/1989FiledRecord Completed
10/18/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04. DAS PANELFEST SCDATE 101289 SCHPRD VS
11/02/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(80 PGS/SWAGERTY) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 113089 SCHPRD BA
04/09/1990ORDER APPELLEE IS DIRECTED TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 010290 SCHPRD BE
05/09/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/09/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD BE
09/25/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/25/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWTEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELNWTEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/18/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD