Case Information: 46767 | |||
Short Caption: | CRUTCHER (BYRON) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 32140 , 38451 , 41708 , 42355 , 43791 , 44569 , 49165 , 49347 , 51930 , 54062 , 55187 , 55266 , 57252 , 57658 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 96C136562 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/31/2006 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/15/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/15/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 06-03301 | |
02/24/2006 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. 2/7/06 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Due Date: 10 days | ||
03/03/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on February 7, 2006. | 06-04814 | |
03/31/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. | 06-06810 | |
05/31/2006 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 5. | 06-11421 | |
05/31/2006 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/13/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP07M-MG/WM/MD | 06-18876 | |
10/10/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-20645 | |
10/10/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/17/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 12, 2006. | 06-20645 |