judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AMERICAN MOTORISTS INSURANCE AMERICAN SECURITY BANK N.A.

Case Information: 86-CV-0512
Short Caption:AMERICAN MOTORISTS INSURANCE AMERICAN SECURITY BANK N.A.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA5057-83Filed Date:03/17/1986

Opening Event Date:03/17/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/10/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/12/1987
Argued/Submitted:07/09/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/29/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Christopher E. HassellYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Dale A. CooterYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901AMERICAN MOTORISTS INSURANCE COMPANY AMERICAN SECURITY BANK N.A.
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 4/8/86 ORD: SUA SPONTE NOTE - 01 CONSOLIDATING NOS. 86-456 AND NOTE - 02 86-512 FOR ALL PURPOSES; NO NOTE - 02 7A; APLT/X-APLE IN 10 DAYS TO NOTE - 03 FILE DR/SRT W/CLK OF SUPR CT NOTE - 03 AND SERVE COPIES UPON CLK OF NOTE - 04 THIS COURT AND APLE/X-APLT NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 CON 86-456 NOTE - 05
01/01/1905TRDATE- 87/07/09 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - COOTERD FOR - ASB ATTY 2 - HASSELLC FOR - AMIC
03/17/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/26/1986CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/08/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 4 SL PANELPY SCDATE 041086 SCHPRD CHECK
04/21/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD & SRT (AMERICAN SECURITY) GG PANEL SCDATE 041886 SCHPRD DR
05/01/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (EXHIBIT: 1 LARGE BROWN ENVELOPE)(RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 060986 SCHPRD R
05/01/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (DEPOSITIONS) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/10/1986FiledRecord Completed
11/10/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (182 PGS - WHALEN) JB PANEL SCDATE 060286 SCHPRD RT
12/22/1986APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 122286 SCHPRD BA
01/27/1987APLT-X-APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/2/87 GG TTC PANEL SCDATE 012687 SCHPRD BAE
02/02/1987RECEIVED APLT-X-APLE BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1987FiledBriefing Completed
02/12/1987APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S BRIEF TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1987APPELLEE-CROSS-APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF (M-24) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/06/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO POSTPONE/CONTINUE ARGUMENT (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/09/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/09/1987ARGUED PANELNWFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/09/1987ORDER DENY MO OF APLT-X-APLE FOR CONTINUANCE OF ORAL ARG. DAS PANELNWFEBE SCDATE 070987 SCHPRD CHECK
03/07/1988AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF TRIAL COURT JDGMT PANELNWFEBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -BE CITE 538 A.2d 736
03/07/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - BE PAGE # - 0396
03/29/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD