Case Information: 40953 | |||
Short Caption: | DYER (ROBERT) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR3939 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/18/2003 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/18/2003 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/18/2003 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 03-02718 | |
03/14/2003 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 10/29/02. Court Reporter: Sheldon Hensley. | 03-04338 | |
03/17/2003 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: Ocotber 29, 2002 through Ocotber 31, 2002. Court Reporter: Sheldon Hensley. Filed in district court on: 03/10/03. | 03-04491 | |
03/19/2003 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: April 7, 2003. | 03-04655 | |
03/28/2003 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 10/30/02. Court Reporter: Sheldon Hensley. | 03-05238 | |
04/07/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 03-05815 | |
04/07/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Joint Appendix. | 03-05816 | |
04/17/2003 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: October 30, 2002. Court Reporter: Sheldon L. Hensley (Different from transcript filed on 3/28/02). | 03-06676 | |
04/28/2003 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 15 pages. | 03-07249 | |
04/28/2003 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 03-07251 | |
04/28/2003 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 03-07253 | |
06/10/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Full Briefing. Having reviewed the fast track briefs filed by counsel in this matter, this court has now concluded that full briefing is warranted. fn1[Counsel need not file a new appendix and may utilize the fast track appendix previously filed in this court. If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, the party must file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] Appellant shall have to and including July 25, 2003, to file and serve the opening brief. fn2[In the absence of an object to the sufficiency of the rough draft transcripts, counsel need not file a certified transcript in this appeal as ordinarily required by NRAP 9. Should either counsel object to the sufficiency of the rough draft transcript or cite to transcripts not previously prepared, counsel shall file and serve a request for the necessary transcripts.] | 03-09649 | |
07/29/2003 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 03-12774 | |
08/26/2003 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 03-14337 | |
10/10/2003 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed. | ||
11/18/2003 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 03-19181 | |
11/18/2003 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/11/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP04S-MS/RR/WM | 04-02645 | |
03/09/2004 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 04-02682 | |
03/09/2004 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/29/2004 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 11, 2004. | 04-02682 |