judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEWIS E. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-1062
Short Caption:LEWIS E. JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8067-84Filed Date:08/12/1988

Opening Event Date:08/12/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/18/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/28/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLewis E. Johnson N
Matthew C. LeeferNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, LEWIS E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: IVORY A. HOLLIS NOTE - 01
01/01/1906 LEEFERM VACATED 7/6/89.
08/12/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/31/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MATTHEW C. LEEFER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1988ORDER DSA DUE IN 10 DAYS - NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 091288 SCHPRD DSA
10/17/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD DSA
11/18/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/18/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/18/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 101188 SCHPRD R
12/28/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/27/89 (NO OPE) MLR PANEL SCDATE 122888 SCHPRD BA
01/06/1989ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 1/27/89. PB PANELRO SCDATE 010989 SCHPRD CHECK
01/27/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 012789 SCHPRD BA
02/23/1989LETTER ANDERS LTR TO APLT; RESPONSE DUE BY 3/24/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 021589 SCHPRD X
07/06/1989AFFIRMED GRANT MO OF COUNSEL TO W/D; AFFIRM ORDER ON APPEAL. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 041189 SCHPRD TMC
07/06/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE
07/28/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD