judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREGORY JR., ROGER M.

Case Information: 86-SP-0767
Short Caption:GREGORY JR., ROGER M.Classification:Appeals - Special Proceedings - Other Special Proceedings
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SP600-86Filed Date:05/07/1986

Opening Event Date:05/07/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/12/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/05/1987
Argued/Submitted:06/03/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerRoger Gregory NPro SeN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Karen S. Dworkin NN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Mary L. WilsonYY
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GREGORY JR., ROGER M. IN THE MATTER OF
05/07/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/12/1986FiledRecord Completed
02/05/1987FiledBriefing Completed
06/03/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/15/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition