judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BENJAMIN J. SILVERS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-221)
Case Number:06-221Case Docketed On:09/27/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:BENJAMIN J. SILVERS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BENJAMIN J. SILVERS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBenjamin J. SilversD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
Ryan R. Roden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/27/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/27/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/27/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/13/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/13/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/27/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/28/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/13/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with wavierMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
02/14/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntaryOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
02/14/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal