judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HUBBLE (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATE

Case Information: 46779
Short Caption:HUBBLE (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 48048 , 72537
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C189061Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/21/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/15/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/15/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-03354
03/01/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-04655
04/21/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 11/03/06--ROA transferred to no. 48048 06-08532
04/21/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/10/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-14092
08/04/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-15739
08/04/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/18/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 8, 2006. 06-15739
11/03/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. the clerk of this court shall transfer the Record on Appeal from Docket No. 46779 to Docket No. 48048. Further, we hereby modify our order of October 6, 2006, in Docket No. 48048 directing the clerk of the district court to transmit the complete trial court record. The clerk of the district court shall have 20 days from the date of this order to certify and transmit to the clerk of this court, as a supplemental record on appeal, those documents filed in Case No. C189061 after transmission of the former record filed in Docket No. 46779. If no additional documents have been filed since transmission of the former record, the clerk of the district court shall so notify this court in writing within the same time period. Nos. 46779 and 48048 (not consolidated). 06-22564
11/03/2006Other Other. Record on Appeal transferred from Docket No. 46779 to Docket No. 48048.