judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT R. HAMILTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0987
Short Caption:ROBERT R. HAMILTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1165-81Filed Date:08/03/1988

Opening Event Date:08/03/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/01/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/08/1989
Argued/Submitted:11/20/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/20/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert R. Hamilton N
Thomas K. Clancy YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Michael L. SpekterNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Sharon M. Collins YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAMILTON, ROBERT R. AKA ROBERT A. REQUILMAN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 (SEE: 81-1522, 83-1303, NOTE - 01 83-1370, 84-1375, 85-1187, NOTE - 02 87-196 & 88-279) NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 12/9/88 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 03 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & NOTE - 04 APPMT OF THOMAS K. CLANCY IS NOTE - 04 VACATED & MICHAEL L. SPEKTER NOTE - 05 APPTD FOR APLT; NEWLY APPTD NOTE - 05 COUNSEL TO INFORM CRT IN 20 NOTE - 06 DAYS WHETHER A SUPP BRF WILL NOTE - 06 BE FILED ON BEHALF OF APLT; NOTE - 07 MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF NOTE - 07 HELD IN ABEY PENDG RESPONSE NOTE - 08 OF NEWLY APPTD COUNSEL TO THIS NOTE - 08 ORDER. NOTE - 09 1/17/89 ORD GRT APLT MO FO EXT NOTE - 09 OF TM TO FL RESPONSE TO 1/29/ NOTE - 10 89 ANY FURTHER REQ WILL BE NOTE - 10 DISFAVORED & GRTED ONLY IN NOTE - 11 EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES & NOTE - 11 GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL NOTE - 12 BRF TO 1/29/89. NOTE - 12 NOTE - 13 2/23/89 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 13 FOR APLT FOR LV TO FL STATE NOTE - 14 INDICATING THAT HE DOES NOT NOTE - 14 INTEND TO FL SUPP BRF & CLK TO NOTE - 15 FL STATE; GRANT MO OF APLE TO NOTE - 15 EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/3/89.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/11/20 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SPEKTERM FOR - APPELLANT
01/01/1906 CLANCYT VACATED 12/9/88.
08/03/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS K. CLANCY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/23/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 082688 SCHPRD DSA
10/06/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/21/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/01/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD R
11/10/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/10/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 111088 SCHPRD BE
11/17/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 11/13/88 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE, RE COURT-AP- POINTED COUNSEL MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MICHAEL L. SPEKTER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03-08. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 102588 SCHPRD N
12/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 1/29/89 TO ANSWER ORDER OF 12/9/88 MLR PANEL SCDATE 122988 SCHPRD ANSA
12/22/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 12/18/88 FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE, RE COURT AP- POINTED COUNSEL MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS: 9-12 PB PANELRBH SCDATE 122988 SCHPRD CHECK
01/30/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3-3-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 012989 SCHPRD BE
02/01/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO DECEMBER 9TH COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 012989 SCHPRD ANSA
02/02/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO FILE STATEMENT RE: APPEAL OUT OF TIME RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 13-15. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD X
02/23/1989STATEMENT OF COUNSEL FOR APLT INDICATING THAT A SUPP BRF WILL NOT BE FILED. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-6-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 030389 SCHPRD BE
03/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 4/6/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD CHECK
04/06/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/8/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 040689 SCHPRD BE
04/26/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 5/8/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 041889 SCHPRD OPA
05/10/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OUT OF TIME JB PANEL SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD BE
05/10/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1989FiledBriefing Completed
06/08/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 060689 SCHPRD M
10/10/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1989LETTER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ARG ON SUM CAL OF 11/20/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD OPE
11/20/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/20/1989ARGUED PANELNWBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWBEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/20/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD