Case Information: 46778 | |||
Short Caption: | MARTINEZ (MARIO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C200592 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/24/2006 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/15/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/15/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 06-03353 | |
03/01/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. | 06-04654 | |
04/24/2006 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 06-08594 | |
04/24/2006 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/05/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP | 06-13793 | |
08/01/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-14790 | |
08/01/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/08/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 3, 2006. | 06-14790 |