judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MAURICE DAVIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0985
Short Caption:MAURICE DAVIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7032-87Filed Date:08/02/1988

Opening Event Date:08/02/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/01/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/05/1990
Argued/Submitted:04/11/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/04/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMaurice Davis N
Robert J. Dowlut YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Barbara J. Valliere YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DAVIS, MAURICE UNITED STATES
08/02/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT J. DOWLUT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/22/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 082688 SCHPRD DSA
11/01/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/01/1988RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD R
07/05/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(253 PGS/RHOADES) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AND LIST AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/05/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 9TH JB PANEL SCDATE 101789 SCHPRD BE
10/11/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRF RJG PANEL SCDATE 101789 SCHPRD OPA
10/23/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/9/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 102389 SCHPRD CHECK
11/07/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-7-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 110989 SCHPRD BE
11/14/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 112089 SCHPRD OPA
12/01/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 12/07/89; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD V
12/08/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 120789 SCHPRD BE
12/08/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/20/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/05/1990FiledBriefing Completed
01/05/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1990CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 OF APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/13/1990MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 2/7/90 CITATION OF APLE TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/11/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGNWKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELRGNWKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/04/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD