judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC BARRETT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0971
Short Caption:ERIC BARRETT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5472-81Filed Date:07/29/1988

Opening Event Date:07/29/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/15/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/10/1989
Argued/Submitted:09/12/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/20/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEric Barrett N
Lawrence M. Baskir YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas J. Tourish, Jr.YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BARRETT, ERIC UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: LARRY T. HAGANS NOTE - 01
01/01/1904JUDGE - TE AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
07/29/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) LAWRENCE M. BASKIR, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1988APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSETO 9/15/88 TO COURT ORDER 8/16/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/09/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL DSA W/IN 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORD. PB PANELPY SCDATE 090788 SCHPRD V
09/13/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 091988 SCHPRD DSA
09/15/1988FiledRecord Completed
09/15/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/15/1988RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 092888 SCHPRD R
10/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL UNTIL 1/17/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 102588 SCHPRD BA
11/17/1988ORDER MO TO STAY TREATED AS MXBA & GRANT ONLT TO EXTENT BRF OF APLT DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 110888 SCHPRD Q
12/19/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD BA
01/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 20TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 012089 SCHPRD BE
01/27/1989ORDER GRANTG APPELLEE'S MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF ON OR BEF 2/20/89. CWC PANELRBH SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD X
02/21/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/23/89 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 022089 SCHPRD BE
03/10/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/23/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 030389 SCHPRD CHECK
03/22/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 31, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 032389 SCHPRD BE
03/31/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1989FiledBriefing Completed
04/10/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD V
09/11/1989MOTION TO SUBMIT WITHOUT ARGUMENT OF APPELLANT. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO SUBMIT. DAS PANELROBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/12/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/20/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD