Case Information: 46768 | |||
Short Caption: | NEEL (WILLIAM) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 47060 , 49856 , 56880 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C205157 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/15/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/15/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 06-03302 | |
03/28/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP | 06-06453 | |
04/25/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-07205 | |
04/25/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/05/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 27, 2006. | 06-07205 |