judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AZODE, LOUIS A. SEAY, MYRNA L.

Case Information: 86-CV-0513
Short Caption:AZODE, LOUIS A. SEAY, MYRNA L.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA1607-85Filed Date:03/17/1986

Opening Event Date:03/17/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/22/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/20/1986
Argued/Submitted:03/18/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Douglas R. Stevens YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Leonard C. Greenebaum NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
J. E. Wingfield NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Thomas C. Junker YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901AZODE, LOUIS A. SEAY, MYRNA L.
03/17/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/22/1986FiledRecord Completed
10/20/1986FiledBriefing Completed
03/18/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/20/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition