Case Information: 46769 | |||
Short Caption: | LAHNER VS. DENIO | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 39769 , 40438 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0101485 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Hardesty | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/17/2006 / King, Patrick | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/19/2007 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/15/2006 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Hardesty. Law firm of Bader & Ryan. | ||
02/15/2006 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Bader & Ryan, Ltd.--check no. 13757. | ||
02/15/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 06-03310 | |
02/17/2006 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/01/2006 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. | 06-04607 | |
03/06/2006 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. | 06-04874 | |
03/10/2006 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. | 06-05240 | |
03/31/2006 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 06-06822 | |
04/05/2006 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 06-07167 | |
04/20/2006 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/13/06. To Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. | 06-08359 | |
04/25/2006 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: October 13, 2005. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. | 06-08689 | |
06/30/2006 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 06-13629 | |
06/30/2006 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 and 2. | 06-13632 | |
07/14/2006 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 31, 2006. | 06-14707 | |
09/01/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 06-18171 | |
09/07/2006 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Answering brief due: September 14, 2006. | 06-18443 | |
09/08/2006 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. for filing Answering Brief (Non- Opposition). | 06-18600 | |
09/15/2006 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 06-19110 | |
10/11/2006 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 16, 2006. | 06-20808 | |
11/16/2006 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 06-23576 | |
07/19/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the SNP Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 07-15716 | |
07/19/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. SNP07-mg/md/mc. | ||
09/28/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND VACATED IN PART." SNP07-MG/MD/MC | 07-21436 | |
10/23/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-22184 | |
10/23/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/30/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 24, 2007. | 07-22184 |