judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SPENCER, JULIA C. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA

Case Information: 86-CV-0514
Short Caption:SPENCER, JULIA C. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA6660-81Filed Date:03/18/1986

Opening Event Date:03/18/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/23/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Adgie O'Bryant, Jr.NN
AppellantJulia C. Spencer NPro SeN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Thomas Fortune Fay NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Edward P. Thompson NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SPENCER, JULIA C. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
01/01/1906 O'BRYANTA WITHDRAW - 1/16/87
03/18/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/23/1986FiledRecord Completed
05/11/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition