judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CROUSE (DEAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 46760
Short Caption:CROUSE (DEAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR0504033Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/20/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/14/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/14/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-03256
03/01/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-04650
03/20/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 06-05899
03/20/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/19/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP06-MD/NB/RP 06-08190
05/16/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-08295
05/16/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/05/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 23, 2006. 06-08295