judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MCQUEEN, GLORIA LUSTINE REALTY COMPANY INC.

Case Information: 86-CV-0474
Short Caption:MCQUEEN, GLORIA LUSTINE REALTY COMPANY INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Lead:86-CV-0474Consolidated: 86-CV-0475
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LT51179-84Filed Date:03/19/1986

Opening Event Date:03/19/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/19/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/06/1987
Argued/Submitted:01/15/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/18/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus-AppellantJohn Doe N
Ellen M. Scully YN
Amicus-AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael R. Mcadoo YN
Amicus-AppelleeJohn Doe N
Richard W. LuchsYY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Harnam S. Arneja YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Brian D. RigerNN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Robert W. Gildar YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCQUEEN, GLORIA LUSTINE REALTY COMPANY INC.
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 86-475 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 9/2/88 JDGMT: FURTHER ORDERING NOTE - 02 THAT MERITS OF THIS CASE TO BE NOTE - 03 CONSIDERED BY CT DIVISION NOTE - 03 ORIGINALLY ASSIGNED TO HEAR NOTE - 04 THESE APPEALS. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 11/9/88 ORD: SUA SPONTE THAT NOTE - 05 APLTS W/I 10 DAYS TO SHOW NOTE - 06 CAUSE WHY SUMMARY AFFIRM. SHLD NOTE - 06 NOT BE ENTERED IN THE ABOVE- NOTE - 07 ENTITLED APPEALS IN LIGHT OF NOTE - 07 THIS CT'S DEC. IN ROMONA NOTE - 08 BLACKNALL, ET AL V. D.C. NOTE - 08 RENTAL HSG. COMM., ET AL., NOTE - 09 544 A.2D 710 (D.C. 1988). NOTE - 09
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/01/15 ACTION - EBARG ATTY 1 - ARNEJAH FOR - APPELLANTS ATTY 2 - SCULLYE FOR - AMICUS CURIAE ATTY 3 - RIGERB FOR - APPELLEE TRDATE- 88/01/15 ACTION - EBARG ATTY 1 - MCADOOM FOR - AMICUS CURIAE
03/19/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/12/1986ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS OTSC WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED. (NO DR & FEE) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 033186 SCHPRD DR
05/19/1986RECEIVED DESIGNATION OF RECORD AND STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1986RECEIVED APPELLANT'S ANSWER TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RJG PANEL SCDATE 052286 SCHPRD ANSA
05/20/1986APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO OTSC RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/20/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD & SRT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/20/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE 86-474 & 86-475 GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/20/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE GG PANEL SCDATE 060286 SCHPRD CHECK
05/28/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1986RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 060286 SCHPRD CHECK
06/12/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (37 PGS - BOSTON; 70 PGS - KACZOROWSKI)(NO SLIP SENT PENDING MCONA) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1986FiledRecord Completed
06/19/1986ORDER GRANT MO TO CONS #86-474 & 86- 475, APLTS BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 060286 SCHPRD OPE
07/25/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/28/86 GG TTC PANEL SCDATE 072986 SCHPRD BA
09/03/1986ORDER APLTS IN 10 DAYS OTSC WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED. (NO BA) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 082886 SCHPRD BA
09/04/1986RECEIVED OPE TO MOTION TO DEFER FURTHER BRIEFING SCHEDULE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF PENDING DISPOSITION OF APLT'S MOTION FOR STAY IN 85-1358 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1986APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEFER FURTHER BRIEFING MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1986APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 9/3/86 COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/09/1987ORDER APLT BRF DUE IN 40 DAYS & APLE BRF DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. ACG PANELPY SCDATE 112686 SCHPRD RBH
02/18/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 25TH JB PANEL SCDATE 021887 SCHPRD BA
02/25/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 9TH JB PANEL SCDATE 030287 SCHPRD OPE
03/03/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (61 PGS - BOSTON) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1987ORDER GRT MOS CLK IS DIR TO FILE THE LDGD APLT'S BR; APLE'S BR DUE IN 30 DAYS. TTC PANELPY SCDATE 030987 SCHPRD OPE
04/06/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 6TH JB PANEL SCDATE 041587 SCHPRD BE
04/14/1987APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 042087 SCHPRD OPA
04/22/1987ORDER GRT MO; APLE'S BR DUE 5/6/87; NFX TTC PANELPY SCDATE 042087 SCHPRD OPA
05/06/1987FiledBriefing Completed
05/06/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 050687 SCHPRD BE
10/21/1987ORDER ss, CLK TO REMOVE CASE FROM REG CAL OF 10/21/87. DAS PANELNWBEST SCDATE 102187 SCHPRD CREG
11/05/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (61 PGS - BOSTON) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/18/1987AMICUS CURIAE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 22, 1987 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1987AMICUS CURIAE'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/23/1987AMICUS CURIAE'S BRIEF CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/23/1987AMICUS CURIAE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/23/1987RECEIVED AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO INCORPORATE BY REF. AMICUS BRIEF & REPLY BRF OF ELLEN SCULLY RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF (AMICUS CURIAE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1988AMICUS CURIAE'S REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY (RENEWED) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/15/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/15/1988EN BANC ARGUMENT (PY MK NW FE BE TE RG ST) PANELEB SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/25/1988LETTER FROM AMICUS CURIAE RE 28(K) MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/28/1988RECEIVED APLE'S OPPO TO APLT'S RENEWED MOTION FOR STAY PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1988ORDER DENY MO OF APLTS TO STAY W/OUT PREJ TO SEEKING RELIEF IN TRL CRT. DAS PANELNWBEST SCDATE 012588 SCHPRD CHECK
04/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (15 PGS - BOSTON) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/09/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APLT TO ROLLBACK INCREASE IN THE PROTECTIVE ORDER OF 3/12/87 (EMERGENCY) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1988APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO EMERGENCY MOTION ROLLBACK INCREASE IN PROTECTIVE ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 052388 SCHPRD OPE
09/02/1988MEMORANDUM JUDGMENT ALLOWING APPEAL (SEE NOTE FIELDS 2-4) (PRINTED @ 547 A.2d 172) PANELEB SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/09/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 5 THRU 9 SL PANELNWBEST SCDATE 102788 SCHPRD VS
11/15/1988APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSETO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 11/9/88 TO 12/15/88 MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/17/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLTS TO EXT TM TO FL RESPONSE TO 11/9 OTSC BY 12/9/88. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 112188 SCHPRD ANSA
12/09/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATED 11/9/88 GT PANEL SCDATE 120988 SCHPRD ANSA
12/28/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/28/1988ORDER THAT THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED AS MOOT SL PANELNWBEST SCDATE 102788 SCHPRD VS
12/28/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
01/18/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD