judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

REGINALD L. LOTT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 88-CF-0989
Short Caption:REGINALD L. LOTT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11620-87Filed Date:08/04/1988

Opening Event Date:08/04/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/01/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/23/1989
Argued/Submitted:09/01/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/27/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantReginald L. Lott N
Roger C. Wesley YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Jock A. Banks YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LOTT, REGINALD L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ALBERT E. MARTIN NOTE - 01
08/04/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/16/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROGER C. WESLEY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/28/1988ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA - NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 082688 SCHPRD DSA
10/07/1988APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT MLR PANEL SCDATE 101088 SCHPRD DSA
11/01/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/01/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1988RECORD ON APPEAL (93 PGS RT - RUST) GT PANEL SCDATE 100388 SCHPRD R
11/17/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 121288 SCHPRD BA
12/22/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 19, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 122088 SCHPRD BE
12/29/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 1/19/89. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 123088 SCHPRD CHECK
01/18/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 21, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 011989 SCHPRD BE
02/02/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR TO 2/21/89. -NFX. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD M
02/21/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 3/23/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD BE
03/15/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(30 PGS/RUST) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/17/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/23/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD Q
03/23/1989FiledBriefing Completed
03/23/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 032389 SCHPRD BE
09/01/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/01/1989SUBMITTED PANELRGNWST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELRGNWST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
09/27/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD